MA H62 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Karen T. O'Neil, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Temporary Rules.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Karen T. O'Neil, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third, and passed to be engrossed |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2021-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4341 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2022
H4523 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2022
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H2775 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4523 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2022
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H2775 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2777 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H62 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H62.pdf |