MA H595 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to directing the Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to include the history of working people and the labor movement in the United States in its academic standards. Education.
Title
Relative to teaching the history of working people
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5135 |
2021-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S325 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H711 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H593 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
H5135 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H711 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
H593 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5074
H5135 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H595 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H595.pdf |