MA H585 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H127

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to student data privacy. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to student data privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24HouseAccompanied H127
2021-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H611 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
H3999 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S313 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H540 (Similar To) 2021-07-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H691 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S325 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H127 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback