MA H57 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Hearing scheduled for 03/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03JointHearing scheduled for 03/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-02-18SenateSenate concurred
2021-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback