MA H565 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to opioid prescribing practices and health insurance access to pain management. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to opioid prescribing practices and access to pain management

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2017-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/14/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1372 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4865 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4921 (Similar To) 2018-10-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback