MA H552 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to early education and care. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring high quality early education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01JointHearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-06-21JointHearing scheduled for 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H558 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
S270 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
S345 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
H470 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback