MA H470 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to affordable and accessible high quality early education and care. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to affordable and accessible high quality early education and care

Sponsors

Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01JointHearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-06-21JointHearing scheduled for 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H558 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
H520 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
S345 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
S270 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H552 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback