MA H5417 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Hull be authorized to lease certain property and to extend leases on certain property to promote economic development and the more effective use of town property. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Hull to lease certain property and to extend leases on certain property to promote economic development and the more effective use of town property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-12-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-12-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4286 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2022
H4235 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4667
H4667 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 191 of the Acts of 2022
H4235 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4667
H4667 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 191 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5417 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5417.pdf |