MA H5374 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5389 for section 253
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5389 for section 253
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill relating to economic growth and relief for the Commonwealth (House, No. 5034), reports, in part, recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 5374).
Title
Relating to economic growth and relief for the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | House | For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5389 for section 253 |
2022-11-17 | House | For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5388 for section 115 |
2022-11-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-11-17 | House | For message, see H5390 |
2022-11-10 | Governor returned to the House with vetoes and amendments to certain sections | |
2022-11-10 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 268 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-11-03 | House | Enacted |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-11-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-11-03 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2022-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-11-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2022-11-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-11-02 | House | Reported on H5034 |
2022-11-02 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H5034 (Replaced by) 2022-11-02 - Reported by H5374
H5007 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Published as amended, see H5034
H4864 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4720 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4864
H4977 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Rejected
H5388 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5389 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5390 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5007 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Published as amended, see H5034
H4864 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4720 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4864
H4977 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Rejected
H5388 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5389 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5390 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5374 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5374.pdf |