MA H5007 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5034
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-14 - Published as amended, see H5034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-14 - Published as amended, see H5034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to economic growth and relief for the commonwealth
Title
Relating to economic growth and relief for the commonwealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-14 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-14 - House - House Consolidated amendment E adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-14 - House - House Consolidated amendment D adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-14 - House - House Consolidated amendment C adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-14 - House - House Consolidated amendment B adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-13 - House - House Consolidated amendment A adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-14 - House - House Consolidated amendment E adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-14 - House - House Consolidated amendment D adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-14 - House - House Consolidated amendment C adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-14 - House - House Consolidated amendment B adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-13 - House - House Consolidated amendment A adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-14 | House | Published as amended, see H5034 |
2022-07-14 | House | Amendment 870 adopted |
2022-07-14 | House | Consolidated amendment E adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 218 ) |
2022-07-14 | House | Consolidated amendment D adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 216 ) |
2022-07-14 | House | Consolidated amendment C adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 215 ) |
2022-07-14 | House | Consolidated amendment B adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 214 ) |
2022-07-14 | House | Amendment 824 rejected |
2022-07-13 | House | Consolidated amendment A adopted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 213 ) |
2022-07-13 | House | Amendment 813 rejected |
2022-07-13 | House | Amendment 630 rejected |
2022-07-13 | House | Read third |
2022-07-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-11 | House | Reported on a part of H4864 |
2022-07-11 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4864 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4720 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4864
H4977 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Rejected
H5034 (Replaced by) 2022-11-02 - Reported by H5374
S3018 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - See H5034
S3030 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - See H5034
H5374 (Similar To) 2022-11-17 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5389 for section 253
H4720 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4864
H4977 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Rejected
H5034 (Replaced by) 2022-11-02 - Reported by H5374
S3018 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - See H5034
S3030 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - See H5034
H5374 (Similar To) 2022-11-17 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5389 for section 253