MA H4720 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4864
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4864
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4864
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Investing in future opportunities for resiliency, workforce, and revitalized downtowns
Title
Investing in future opportunities for resiliency, workforce, and revitalized downtowns
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4864 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-25 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 13, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4864 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4977 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Rejected
H5007 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Published as amended, see H5034
H5034 (Similar To) 2022-11-02 - Reported by H5374
H5374 (Similar To) 2022-11-17 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5389 for section 253
H4977 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Rejected
H5007 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Published as amended, see H5034
H5034 (Similar To) 2022-11-02 - Reported by H5374
H5374 (Similar To) 2022-11-17 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5389 for section 253
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4720 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4720.pdf |