MA H5168 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H5163
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a sick leave bank for Tonita Poston, an employee of the Office of the Commissioner of Probation
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Tonita Poston, an employee of the Office of the Commissioner of Probation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-14 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-12-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-12-07 | House | New draft of H5163 |
2020-12-07 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H5163 (Replaces) 2020-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5168
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5168 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5168.pdf |