MA H515 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing education funding from certain gaming activity proceeds. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to increasing education funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3974 |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H518 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3974
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
H3974 (Replaced by) 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
H2215 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S358 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S357 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
H3974 (Replaced by) 2021-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H3977
H2215 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S358 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H515 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H515.pdf |