MA H5084 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2227
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Incorporating the public health lessons learned from the Fukushima nuclear disaster
Title
Incorporating the public health lessons learned from the Fukushima nuclear disaster
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-07-26 | House | New draft of H2227 |
2022-07-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2227 (Replaces) 2022-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5084
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1448 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5104 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1448 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5104 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1521 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5084 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5084.pdf |