MA H5017 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Clinton be authorized to continue the employment of police chief Mark R. Laverdure. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Clinton to continue the employment of police chief Mark R. Laverdure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-12-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-11-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-10-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5017 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5017.pdf |