MA H5016 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4845
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Wellesley to grant certain licenses for the temporary sale of alcoholic beverages
Title
Authorizing the town of Wellesley to grant certain licenses for the temporary sale of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-28 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-12 | House | New draft of H4845 |
2022-07-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4845 (Replaces) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5016
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S612 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H4260 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2021
H4115 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4260
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S612 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H4260 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2021
H4115 (Similar To) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4260
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5016 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5016.pdf |