MA H4947 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-14 - Hearing scheduled for 08/19/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to a moratorium on the Massachusetts Comprehensive Assessment System (MCAS) in response to the COVID-19 emergency. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning a moratorium on the MCAS in response to the Covid-19 Emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-14JointHearing scheduled for 08/19/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2020-08-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-08-10HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education
2020-06-30HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback