MA H4911 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making certain appropriations for Fiscal Year 2023 before final action on the General Appropriation Bill
Title
Making certain appropriations for Fiscal Year 2023 before final action on the General Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-06-27 | House | Enacted |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-27 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-06-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-06-27 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-06-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4430 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Text of a further amendment, see H4345
H4127 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
H4200 (Similar To) 2021-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2021
H4078 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4881 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4932 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2022
H5394 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4127 (Similar To) 2021-09-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 55 of the Acts of 2021
H4200 (Similar To) 2021-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2021
H4078 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4881 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4932 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2022
H5394 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4911 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4911.pdf |