MA H4881 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 08/10/2020 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 08/10/2020 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of licensing boards of certain cities and towns. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to licensing board membership
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/10/2020 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-08-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/24/2020 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-08-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/10/2020 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-07-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-09 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2019-09-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4881 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4881.pdf |