MA H487 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of certain data by behavioral health management firms and other third party administrators. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the transparency of mental health benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] |
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H110 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1061 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4710
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H487 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H487.pdf |