MA H4863 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Vieira of Falmouth, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of David T. Vieira, Susan L. Moran and Steven George Xiarhos (by vote of the town) that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey certain easements to the town of Bourne for subsurface waterline purposes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant certain easements to the town of Bourne
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2024 from 12:55 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-07-10 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2024-06-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4645 (Similar To) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2024
H4965 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4966 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4964 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4965 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4966 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4964 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4863 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4863.pdf |