MA H4860 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to voting precincts in the city of Chicopee. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to voting precincts in the city of Chicopee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-07-26 | House | Enacted |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-07-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4823 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2022
H4875 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2022
H5328 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 331 of the Acts of 2022
H4875 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2022
H5328 (Similar To) 2022-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 331 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4860 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4860.pdf |