MA H4800 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4791
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - H4791, published as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - H4791, published as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to equity in the cannabis industry (Senate, No. 2823), as changed by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading and as amended by the House. May 18, 2022.
Title
Relative to equity in the cannabis industry
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | H4791, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4791 (Replaces) 2022-05-18 - Published as amended, see H4800
H166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S63 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H158 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S63 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H158 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4800 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4800.pdf |