MA H4764 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Blackstone be authorized to continue the employment of fire chief Michael Sweeney. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Blackstone to continue the employment of fire chief Michael Sweeney
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-08-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-08-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2018 from 10:30 AM-11:30 AM in B-2 |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-07-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4764 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4764.pdf |