MA H4726 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to stimulus checks to immigrant taxpayers. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide equal stimulus checks to immigrant taxpayers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02SenateSenate concurred
2020-06-18HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-06-11SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-26HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-05-18JointHearing scheduled for 05/19/2020 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in Virtual Hearing
2020-05-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue
2020-04-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback