MA H4720 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 463 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reconciling inconsistent statutory audit schedules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reconciling inconsistent statutory audit schedules

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-13 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 463 of the Acts of 2016
2017-01-03SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-01-03HouseEnacted
2017-01-03SenateRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2016-12-28HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2016-11-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-11-07HouseRules suspended
2016-11-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2016-11-07HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2016-11-07HouseOrdered to a third reading
2016-11-07HouseNew draft of H4
2016-11-07HousePending new draft of H4
2016-11-07HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4 (Replaces) 2016-11-07 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4720
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4765 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2233
H4766 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Text of an amendment, see S2377
H4767 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback