MA H4665 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4131
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 238 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 238 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of Salem to grant an additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises of Peter's Bella Pizza at 84 Highland Avenue
Title
Authorizing the city of Salem to grant an additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises of Peter's Bella Pizza at 84 Highland Avenue
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 238 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-10-13 | House | Enacted |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-11 | House | New draft of H4131 |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4131 (Replaces) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4665
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
S1016 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
S1016 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4665 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4665.pdf |