MA H4131 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Salem be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises in said city. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Salem to grant an additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises of Peter's Bella Pizza at 84 Highland Avenue
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4665 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday December 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-09-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4129 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
S1016 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4665 (Replaced by) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 238 of the Acts of 2022
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4129 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
S1016 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4665 (Replaced by) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 238 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4131 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4131.pdf |