MA H3933 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4663
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Milford be authorized to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be consumed on the premises in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Milford to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be consumed on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4663 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday December 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-07-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3714 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4267 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4668
H4663 (Replaced by) 2022-10-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 231 of the Acts of 2022
H4668 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 239 of the Acts of 2022
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3714 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4267 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4668
H4663 (Replaced by) 2022-10-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 231 of the Acts of 2022
H4668 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 239 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3933 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3933.pdf |