MA H4668 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4267
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 239 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 239 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Milford to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be consumed on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Milford to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be consumed on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 239 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-10-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-10-13 | House | Enacted |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-10-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-14 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-06-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-11 | House | New draft of H4267 |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4267 (Replaces) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4668
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4663 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 231 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H4815 (Similar To) 2022-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 203 of the Acts of 2022
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4663 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 231 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H4815 (Similar To) 2022-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 203 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4668 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4668.pdf |