MA H4657 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the recall of elected officials in the town of Hanson. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for the recall of elected officials in the town of Hanson
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-21 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-19 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-10-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-10-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-10-04 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Election Laws |
2018-10-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-10-04 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-25 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3699 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4476
H4476 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1687 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3297 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4996 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 411 of the Acts of 2018
H4476 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1687 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3297 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4996 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 411 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4657 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4657.pdf |