MA H4476 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3699). May 7, 2018.
Title
Relative to the recall of elected officials in the town of Carlisle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Enacted |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-05-07 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-07 | House | Substituted for H3699 |
Same As/Similar To
H3699 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4476
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1687 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3297 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4533 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4966
H4657 (Similar To) 2018-11-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4996 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 411 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1687 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3297 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4533 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4966
H4657 (Similar To) 2018-11-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4996 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 411 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4476 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4476.pdf |