MA H3699 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4476
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Carlisle be authorized to recall certain elected officials of said town. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the recall of elected officials in the town of Carlisle
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4476 |
2018-05-07 | House | Read third |
2017-12-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-12-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-12-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-11-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3297 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1687 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4476 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2018
H4533 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4966
H4657 (Similar To) 2018-11-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4996 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 411 of the Acts of 2018
H1687 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4476 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2018
H4533 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4966
H4657 (Similar To) 2018-11-21 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4996 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 411 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3699 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3699.pdf |