MA H4654 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-22 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Diggs of Barnstable, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Kip A. Diggs (with the approval of the county commissioners) that Jeffrey H. Jackson be authorized to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable county retirement board. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing Jeffrey H. Jackson to purchase creditable service from the Barnstable County Retirement Board
Sponsors
Rep. Kip Diggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-12-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-05-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4312 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4656 (Similar To) 2022-06-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4657 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4655 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3968 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4659 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4656 (Similar To) 2022-06-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4657 (Similar To) 2022-06-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4655 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3968 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4659 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4654 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4654.pdf |