MA H4617 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4707
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in the town of Wareham. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in the town of Wareham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4707 |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-09-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4707 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1103 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
H863 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2312 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2309 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2311 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1103 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
H863 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H2312 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2309 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2311 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4617 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4617.pdf |