MA H4607 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2681
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Pembroke be authorized to establish a town manager form of government. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a town manager form of government for the town of Pembroke
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 334 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-20 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-12-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-13 | Senate | New text (deMacedo) substituted, see S2681 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-25 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-22 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2067 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S2161
H3774 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2161 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
H4658 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 344 of the Acts of 2018
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
S2681 (Replaced by) 2018-12-13 - See H4607
H3774 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2161 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
H4658 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 344 of the Acts of 2018
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
S2681 (Replaced by) 2018-12-13 - See H4607
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4607 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4607.pdf |