MA S2067 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S2161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-21 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S2161
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a town manager in the town of West Newbury. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a town manager in the town of West Newbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-21 | Senate | New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S2161 |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Read third |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-05-15 | House | House concurred |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2795 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2017
H3774 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2161 (Replaced by) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
H4087 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2018
H4121 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2018
H4658 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 344 of the Acts of 2018
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
H3774 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2161 (Replaced by) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
H4080 (Similar To) 2018-04-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2018
H4087 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2018
H4121 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2018
H4658 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 344 of the Acts of 2018
H4931 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 434 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2067 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2067.pdf |