MA H4121 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the town manager of the town of Upton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the town manager of the town of Upton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2018
2018-06-06SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-06-06HouseEnacted
2018-06-06SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2018-06-06SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-03-09SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-22SenateRead and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2018-02-20HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-02-01HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-01HouseRules suspended
2018-02-01HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-01-31HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-01-18SenateSenate concurred
2018-01-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4087 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2018
H3726 (Similar To) 2017-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2017
H2795 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2017

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback