MA H4989 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the town manager of the town of Upton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the town manager of the town of Upton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-12-06SenateSenate concurred
2018-12-04HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H2795 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2017
H3726 (Similar To) 2017-09-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2017
H4087 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2018
H4121 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback