MA H4587 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H26
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing the Massachusetts alcohol laws
Title
Modernizing the Massachusetts alcohol laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-14 | House | New draft of H26 |
2022-03-14 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H26 (Replaces) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4587
S1364 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2021
S1355 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 336 of the Acts of 2022
S2031 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2828
H27 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S1364 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2021
S1355 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 336 of the Acts of 2022
S2031 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2828
H27 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4587 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4587.pdf |