MA H4557 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-13 - New draft substituted, see H4871
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-13 - New draft substituted, see H4871
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The registration and inspection of street rods and custom vehicles.
Title
Relative to the registration and inspection of street rods and custom vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-13 | New draft substituted, see H4871 | |
2010-07-13 | Read second | |
2010-07-12 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending | |
2010-07-12 | Referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | |
2010-07-12 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a bill with the same title, see H4871 | |
2010-03-11 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-03-11 | New draft of H3199 and H3201 | |
2010-03-11 | Reported from the committee on Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3199 (Replaces) 2010-03-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4557
H3201 (Replaces) 2010-03-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4557
H4871 (Replaced by) 2010-08-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 311 of the Acts of 2010
H3201 (Replaces) 2010-03-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4557
H4871 (Replaced by) 2010-08-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 311 of the Acts of 2010
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4557 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8366&generalCourtId=2 |