MA H4535 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4663
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disability retirement of Brian Patrick Carroll, a firefighter for the city of Worcester. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the disability retirement of Brian Patrick Carroll, a firefighter for the city of Worcester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4663 |
2018-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1404 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1355 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H4663 (Replaced by) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 377 of the Acts of 2018
H4719 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2018
H1355 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H4663 (Replaced by) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 377 of the Acts of 2018
H4719 (Similar To) 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4535 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4535.pdf |