MA H4719 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to disability retirement benefits for certain public safety personnel in the city of Quincy. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the disability retirement of public safety personnel in the city of Quincy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-31 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2018
2018-10-22SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-10-22HouseEnacted
2018-10-18SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-10-18SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-09-13SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-09-10HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-08-09HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-08-09HouseRules suspended
2018-08-09HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-07-31HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-07-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/30/2018 from 10:30 AM-11:30 AM in B-2
2018-07-11SenateSenate concurred
2018-07-09HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H409 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1932 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1933 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback