MA H4526 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the age requirement for police officers for the city of Malden. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding the age requirement for police officers for the city of Malden
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 185 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-08-15 | House | Enacted |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-05-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-05-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-05-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-04-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/17/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4526 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4526.pdf |