MA H4488 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 251 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 251 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Beverly be authorized to employ Paul Cotter as fire chief, notwithstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Beverly to employ Paul Cotter as Fire Chief beyond the statutory requirement age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 251 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-09-24 | House | Enacted |
2018-09-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2018-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2018-09-20 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-17 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-07-16 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-05-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/23/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3950 (Similar To) 2018-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2018
H4628 (Similar To) 2018-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2018
H4628 (Similar To) 2018-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4488 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4488.pdf |