MA H4477 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H371
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to termination of sales to wholesalers by suppliers of alcoholic beverages
Title
Relative to termination of sales to wholesalers by suppliers of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-05-23 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-04-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-03-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-28 | House | New draft of H371 |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H371 (Replaces) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4477 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4477.pdf |