MA H4477 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-26 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act amending the Bourne home rule charter By Messrs. Vieira of Falmouth and Hunt of Sandwich, a petition of David T. Vieira, Randy Hunt and Therese Murray (by vote of the town) that the town of Bourne be authorized to amend the charter of said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the Bourne home rule charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-26 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4538 |
2014-11-26 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2014-11-26 | House | Read third |
2014-11-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-11-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-11-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-10-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4477 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4477.pdf |