MA H4472 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4701
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit police officers from engaging in sexual relations while on duty. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting police officers from engaging in sexual relations while on duty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4701 |
2018-05-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4701 (Replaced by) 2018-07-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
S1452 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2017
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1380 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4701 (Replaced by) 2018-07-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4918 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4472 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4472.pdf |