MA H4463 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4529
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4529
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4529
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Salem be authorized to grant two additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Salem to grant 2 additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4529 |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-07-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4529 (Replaced by) 2016-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2016
H4737 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4757
H1636 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4393
H1637 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1638 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4313
H2837 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 462 of the Acts of 2016
H4737 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4757
H1636 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4393
H1637 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1638 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4313
H2837 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 462 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4463 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4463.pdf |