MA H4453 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Salem be authorized to further regulate buildings containing two or more residential units in said city. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Salem to enact a condominium conversion ordinance for buildings containing two or more residential units
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tucker [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-12-12 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-10-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-05-02 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2022-05-02 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4312 (Similar To) 2022-07-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4454 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2022
S1016 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4130 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4129 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4131 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4665
H4300 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 221 of the Acts of 2022
H4301 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5303
H4265 (Similar To) 2022-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 204 of the Acts of 2022
H4228 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4454 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2022
S1016 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4130 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4129 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4131 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4665
H4300 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 221 of the Acts of 2022
H4301 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5303
H4265 (Similar To) 2022-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 204 of the Acts of 2022
H4228 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4453 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4453.pdf |